Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1362 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 1362


 AN ACT
 relating to the pilot program for reporting of
 methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus infections.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 81.0445, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.0445. MRSA REPORTING PROCEDURES PILOT PROGRAM. (a)
 The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services
 Commission by rule shall develop and the department shall establish
 a pilot program to research and implement procedures for reporting
 cases of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus (MRSA)
 infection. A health authority shall not be required to participate
 in the pilot program.
 (b) A health authority that participates in the pilot
 program shall administer the program locally and report to the
 department as required by this section. [The department shall
 select to administer the program a health authority that:
 [(1)     demonstrates an interest in hosting the program;
 and
 [(2)     possesses adequate resources to administer the
 program successfully.]
 (c) The pilot program must:
 (1) require all clinical laboratories, including
 hospital laboratories and clinical reference laboratories, within
 the area served by each [the] health authority participating in the
 pilot program to report all positive cases of methicillin-resistant
 Staphylococcus aureus infection, including infections contracted
 in a community setting, a health care facility, and any other
 setting, to the applicable health authority using automated and
 secure electronic data transmission [pilot program administrator];
 (2) track the prevalence of methicillin-resistant
 Staphylococcus aureus infections;
 (3) evaluate [study] the cost and feasibility of
 expanding the list of reportable diseases established under this
 chapter to include methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus
 infections;
 (4) develop a methodology for the electronic transfer
 [exchange] of information regarding [the occurrence of]
 methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus infections within the
 area served by each [the] health authority participating in the
 pilot program;
 (5) collect data and analyze findings regarding the
 prevalence [sources and possible prevention] of
 methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus infections;
 (6) provide for the reporting to the public by the
 department of information regarding methicillin-resistant
 Staphylococcus aureus infections;
 (7) compile and make available to the public a summary
 report[, by location, of the infections reported]; and
 (8) make recommendations to the department regarding
 Subdivisions (1) through (7).
 (d) Not later than September 1, 2011 [2009], the department,
 in consultation with each [the] health authority participating in
 [administering] the pilot program, shall submit to the legislature
 a report concerning the effectiveness of the pilot program [in
 tracking and reducing the number of methicillin-resistant
 Staphylococcus aureus infections within the area served by the
 health authority].
 (d-1)  A health care facility located in an area served by a
 health authority participating in the pilot program is not required
 to report an incident of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus
 aureus infection to the Department of State Health Services under
 Section 98.103, as added by Chapter 359 (S.B. 288), Acts of the 80th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2007. The health authority shall
 report each incident subject to Section 98.103 to the Department of
 State Health Services.
 (e) This section expires, and the pilot program is
 abolished, September 1, 2011 [2009].
 SECTION 2. Section 98.103, Health and Safety Code, as added
 by Chapter 359 (S.B. 288), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2007, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as
 follows:
 (e)  Effective September 1, 2009, this section does not apply
 to the reporting of methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus
 infections by a health care facility located in an area served by a
 health authority participating in the pilot program established
 under Section 81.0445. This subsection expires September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 3. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of this
 section, this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of
 two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by
 Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not
 receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes
 effect on the 91st day after the last day of the legislative
 session.
 (b) The change in law made by this Act to Section
 81.0445(d), Health and Safety Code, takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1362 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1362 on May 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 5,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1362 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor