House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 811 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 490 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 490 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Filed |