Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1372 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Shelton, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 1372
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 22, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 22, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of victim in relation to certain crime
 victims' rights.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Article 56.01(3), Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 amended by Chapters 66 (H.B. 1489) and 268 (S.B. 6), Acts of the
 79th Legislature, Regular Session, 2005, is reenacted and amended
 to read as follows:
 (3) "Victim" means a person who is the victim of the
 offense of sexual assault, kidnapping, aggravated robbery,
 trafficking of persons, or injury to a child, elderly individual,
 or disabled individual or who has suffered personal injury or death
 as a result of the criminal conduct of another.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *