Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1382 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Davis of Dallas (Senate Sponsor - Harris) H.B. No. 1382
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009;
 April 15, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; April 24, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 24, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1382 By: Eltife


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to assessment of certain charges by a commercial landlord
 that is a governmental entity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 93.012, Property Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  This section does not affect the contractual right of a
 landlord that is a governmental entity created under Subchapter D,
 Chapter 22, Transportation Code, whose constituent municipalities
 are populous home rule municipalities to assess charges under a
 lease to fully compensate the governmental entity for the
 governmental entity's operating costs.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effects, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *