Senate | 05/07/2009 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2136 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2136 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2054 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2871 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2459 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Record vote | RV#544 | Journal Page: 2459 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2459 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2459 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2449 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Amended | 1-Pierson | Journal Page: 2449 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2449 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 491 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 491 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Filed |