Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3785 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#923 | Journal Page: 3784 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3784 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3784 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3672 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3672 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3672 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 492 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 492 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Filed |