Senate | 05/27/2009 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 3521 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2758 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2091 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1948 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2337 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#459 | Journal Page: 2260 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2230 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2230 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1092 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 277 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 277 | |
House | 11/10/2008 | Filed |