House | 04/20/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1576 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 948 | Journal Page: 1576 |
House | 04/06/2009 | Postponed | 4/20/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1078 |
House | 04/06/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1078 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 02/18/2009 | Filed |