House | 04/15/2009 | No action taken in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | No action taken in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 498 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 498 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Filed |