House | 05/06/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2614 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 687 | Journal Page: 2614 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Postponed | 5/6/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2394 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2394 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Postponed | 5/4/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2032 |
House | 04/29/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2032 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Postponed | 4/29/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1888 |
House | 04/27/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1888 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Postponed | 4/27/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1797 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1797 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 499 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 499 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Filed |