Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1492 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Driver, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 1492
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 April 24, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 6, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to achievement awards presented by the Commission on Law
 Enforcement Officer Standards and Education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1701.401(f), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f) The commission may present awards relating to not more
 than a total of 20 incidents and accomplishments [awards] each
 year.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *