E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2534
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3970
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3675
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#207
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1583
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1583
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1583
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 500
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|