Senate | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1994 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1718 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#370 | Journal Page: 1979 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1979 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1979 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1911 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Amended | 1-Bonnen | Journal Page: 1911 |
House | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1911 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 501 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 501 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Filed |