E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/21/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4301
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4355
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4075
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2560
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2559
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#240
|
Journal Page: 1704
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1704
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Amended
|
1-McClendon
|
Journal Page: 1703
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1703
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1641
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1641
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1148
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
House
|
02/19/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|