Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1526 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Crownover, et al. H.B. No. 1526
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1526By: Hinojosa By: Hinojosa
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2009;
 May 5, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources; May 25, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a common purchaser that transports
 natural gas by pipeline to use a public right-of-way for a pipeline.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 111, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 111.0831 to read as follows:
 Sec. 111.0831.  AUTHORITY OF CERTAIN COMMON PURCHASERS TO
 USE PUBLIC RIGHT-OF-WAY FOR PIPELINE. (a)  Subject to Section
 121.202, Utilities Code, and Section 182.025, Tax Code, a common
 purchaser as defined by Section 111.081(a)(2) has the right to lay,
 maintain, and operate a pipeline over, under, across, and along a
 public road as provided by this chapter only if:
 (1) the pipeline complies with:
 (A)  all safety regulations adopted by the
 commission relating to the pipeline facilities that are subject to
 this section; and
 (B)  all applicable state and county regulations
 regarding the placement of a pipeline facility on a right-of-way,
 including a regulation on the horizontal placement of the pipeline;
 and
 (2)  the common purchaser ensures that the public road
 and any associated facility is promptly restored to its former
 condition of usefulness after the installation or maintenance of
 the pipeline.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 203.092, Transportation Code,
 the Texas Department of Transportation may require the owner or
 operator of a common purchaser pipeline to relocate the pipeline:
 (1)  at the expense of the owner or operator of the
 common purchaser pipeline, if the common purchaser pipeline is
 located on a right-of-way of the state highway system; or
 (2) at the expense of this state, if:
 (A)  the common purchaser pipeline is located on
 property in which the owner or operator of the common purchaser
 pipeline has a private property interest; or
 (B)  the owner or operator of the common purchaser
 pipeline is otherwise eligible for reimbursement under the
 Transportation Code.
 (c)  A municipality may charge a fee to the owner or operator
 of a common purchaser pipeline for the use of a public road or
 municipal street or alley maintained by the municipality.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *