Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#875 | Journal Page: 3723 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3723 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3723 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3688 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3688 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3301 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 502 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 502 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Filed |