House | 04/22/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 502 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 502 | |
House | 02/19/2009 | Filed |