House | 05/15/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3688 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB1628 | Journal Page: 3688 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1872 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 504 | |
House | 02/20/2009 | Filed |