E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 05/26/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2897 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4640 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4218 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2603 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2603 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2603 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2394 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 2223 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 2223 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Refer to s/c on Flooding & Evacuations by Pres | Journal Page: 1932 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1932 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1629 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1779 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#269 | Journal Page: 1778 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1778 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1778 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1743 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1743 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1034 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 02/20/2009 | Filed |