E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2534
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3970
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2400
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3454
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3454
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#824
|
Journal Page: 3454
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3454
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2867
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2133
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1936
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 925
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1149
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1100
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#116
|
Journal Page: 1100
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1100
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1100
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1077
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Heflin
|
Journal Page: 1077
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1077
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 506
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 506
|
House
|
02/20/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|