E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 05/25/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4992 | |
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4569 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/21/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4305 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2625 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2625 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2625 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2625 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2625 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2625 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2625 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2358 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 2092 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2092 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2010 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2554 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Record vote | RV#524 | Journal Page: 2375 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2375 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2375 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2328 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Amended | 1-Naishtat | Journal Page: 2326 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2326 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Filed |