Senate | 05/11/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2092 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2092 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1949 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#447 | Journal Page: 2251 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 2251 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Amended | 1-T. Smith | Journal Page: 2251 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2251 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2226 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2225 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 530 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 530 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Filed |