Senate | 05/21/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2495 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2495 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2398 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | RV#840 | Journal Page: 3493 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3493 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 1-Laubenberg | Journal Page: 3493 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3493 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3357 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3357 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Amended | 2-Aycock | Journal Page: 3356 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3353 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3353 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Postponed | 5/13/09 2:00 PM | Journal Page: 3352 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3351 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 527 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 527 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Filed |