E | 05/23/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4641 | |
E | 05/14/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3802 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2370 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3673 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3208 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2231 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1997 | |
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 911 | |
Senate | 04/07/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 911 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 825 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1034 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1002 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Record vote | RV#76 | Journal Page: 1001 |
House | 03/31/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1001 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1001 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 974 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 974 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 920 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 528 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 528 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Filed |