E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 05/26/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5164 | |
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2897 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4640 | |
House | 05/24/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4819 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4218 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2602 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2394 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1932 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1932 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1376 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#223 | Journal Page: 1683 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1683 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1683 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1669 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1669 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 977 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 528 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 528 | |
House | 02/23/2009 | Filed |