Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 04/01/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 826 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1034 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Record vote | RV#75 | Journal Page: 1000 |
House | 03/31/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1000 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1000 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 995 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 995 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 811 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 528 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 528 | |
House | 02/24/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 02/23/2009 | Filed |