Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 03/30/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 743 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 942 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Record vote | RV#70 | Journal Page: 941 |
House | 03/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 941 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 941 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 901 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 901 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Amended | 2-S. Turner | Journal Page: 901 |
House | 03/25/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 901 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/19/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 810 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 529 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 529 | |
House | 02/24/2009 | Filed |