Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1697 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R8679 TRH-F
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 1697


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a solar energy technology generation incentive program
 to be administered by electric utilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 39.905, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), (b-4), (d), and (e) and adding
 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a) It is the goal of the legislature that:
 (1) electric utilities will administer in a
 market-neutral, nondiscriminatory manner energy efficiency
 incentive programs and incentive programs for generation capacity
 from solar energy technologies [in a market-neutral,
 nondiscriminatory manner] but will not offer underlying
 competitive services;
 (2) all customers, in all customer classes, will have
 a choice of and access to energy efficiency alternatives, solar
 energy technology systems, and other choices from the market that
 allow each customer to reduce energy consumption, peak demand, or
 energy costs;
 (3) subject to Subsection (a-1), by December 31, 2011,
 each electric utility will provide, through market-based standard
 offer programs or limited, targeted, market-transformation
 programs, incentives sufficient for retail electric providers and
 competitive energy service providers to acquire additional
 cost-effective energy efficiency for residential and commercial
 customers equivalent to at least one[:
 [(A) 10] percent of the electric utility's annual
 gross receipts from retail sales to [growth in demand of
 residential and commercial customers by December 31, 2007;
 [(B)     15 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2008, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2008 funding may not be greater than 75 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for] residential and
 commercial customers, [as included in the April 1, 2006, filing;
 and
 [(C)     20 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2009,] provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for each subsequent year [2009 funding] may not be
 greater than 150 percent of the [above the] utility's program
 budget for [2007 for] residential and commercial customers, as
 filed with the commission in the electric utility's most recent
 [included in the April 1, 2006,] filing under this section;
 (4) each electric utility in the ERCOT region shall
 use its best efforts to encourage and facilitate the involvement of
 the region's retail electric providers in the delivery of
 efficiency programs, solar energy technologies, and demand
 response programs under this section;
 (5) retail electric providers in the ERCOT region, and
 electric utilities outside of the ERCOT region, shall provide
 customers with energy efficiency educational materials and
 information on available solar energy technologies; and
 (6) notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), electric
 utilities shall continue to make available, at 2007 funding and
 participation levels, any load management standard offer programs
 developed for industrial customers and implemented prior to May 1,
 2007.
 (a-1)  In addition to market-neutral standard offer
 programs, it is the intent of the legislature that additional
 generating capacity from solar energy technologies be installed in
 this state by the expenditure of at least 60 percent of the yearly
 balance of the money administered under the program on solar energy
 technologies for residential and commercial customers.  It is the
 intent of the legislature that the total cumulative amount of
 additional generating capacity from solar energy technologies be
 installed as follows:
 (1) at least 200 megawatts by January 1, 2011;
 (2) at least 500 megawatts by January 1, 2013;
 (3) at least 1,500 megawatts by January 1, 2015; and
 (4) at least 3,000 megawatts by January 1, 2019.
 (b) The commission shall provide oversight and adopt rules
 and procedures to ensure that the utilities can achieve the goals
 [goal] of this section, including:
 (1) establishing an energy efficiency cost recovery
 factor for ensuring timely and reasonable cost recovery for utility
 expenditures made to satisfy the goals [goal] of this section;
 (2) establishing an incentive under Section 36.204 to
 reward utilities administering programs under this section that
 exceed the minimum goals established by this section;
 (3) providing a utility that is unable to establish an
 energy efficiency cost recovery factor in a timely manner due to a
 rate freeze with a mechanism to enable the utility to:
 (A) defer the costs of complying with this
 section; and
 (B) recover the deferred costs through an energy
 efficiency cost recovery factor on the expiration of the rate
 freeze period;
 (4) ensuring that the costs associated with programs
 provided under this section are borne by the customer classes that
 receive the services under the programs; [and]
 (5) ensuring the program rules encourage the value of
 the incentives to be passed on to the end-use customer; and
 (6)  encouraging the deployment of solar energy
 technologies.
 (b-4) The commission and ERCOT shall develop a method to
 account for the projected efficiency impacts under Subsection
 (b-3), including any efficiencies that may be achieved through the
 deployment of solar energy technologies as provided by Subsection
 (a-1), in ERCOT's annual forecasts of future capacity, demand, and
 reserves.
 (d) The commission shall establish a procedure for
 reviewing and evaluating market-transformation program options
 described by this subsection and other options. In evaluating
 program options, the commission may consider the ability of a
 program option to reduce costs to customers through reduced demand,
 energy savings, and relief of congestion. Utilities may choose to
 implement any program option approved by the commission after its
 evaluation in order to satisfy the goal in Subsection (a),
 including:
 (1) energy-smart schools;
 (2) appliance retirement and recycling;
 (3) air conditioning system tune-ups;
 (4) the use of trees or other landscaping for energy
 efficiency;
 (5) customer energy management and demand response
 programs;
 (6) high performance residential and commercial
 buildings that will achieve the levels of energy efficiency
 sufficient to qualify those buildings for federal tax incentives;
 (7) programs for customers who rent or lease their
 residence or commercial space;
 (8) programs providing energy monitoring equipment to
 customers that enable a customer to better understand the amount,
 price, and time of the customer's energy use;
 (9) energy audit programs for owners and other
 residents of single-family or multifamily residences and for small
 commercial customers;
 (10) net-zero energy new home programs;
 (11) solar thermal programs, [or] solar electric
 programs, or solar energy technologies as provided by Subsection
 (a-1); and
 (12) programs for using windows and other glazing
 systems, glass doors, and skylights in residential and commercial
 buildings that reduce solar gain by at least 30 percent from the
 level established for the federal Energy Star windows program.
 (e) An electric utility may use money approved by the
 commission for energy efficiency programs to perform necessary
 energy efficiency research and development to foster continuous
 improvement and innovation in the application of energy efficiency
 technology and energy efficiency program design and
 implementation, including the deployment of solar energy
 technologies in the grid. Money the utility uses under this
 subsection may not exceed 10 percent of the greater of:
 (1) the amount the commission approved for energy
 efficiency programs in the utility's most recent full rate
 proceeding; or
 (2) the commission-approved expenditures by the
 utility for energy efficiency in the previous year.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.