Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1708 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R3558 UM-D
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 1708


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision and evaluation of comprehensive substance
 abuse treatment under the state Medicaid program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0226 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0226.  STUDY REGARDING COMPREHENSIVE SUBSTANCE
 ABUSE TREATMENT.  (a)  The commission shall conduct a study
 regarding the cost-effectiveness of providing comprehensive
 substance abuse treatment, as described by Section 32.024(ff),
 Human Resources Code, to Medicaid recipients who are at least 21
 years of age.
 (b)  To evaluate the cost-effectiveness of providing
 comprehensive substance abuse treatment to Medicaid recipients,
 the commission shall identify and use specific outcome measures.
 The outcome measures must be measured in three consecutive years,
 including the year before the year in which the recipient receives
 comprehensive substance abuse treatment, the year in which the
 treatment is first provided to the recipient, and the year
 following the year in which the treatment is first provided to the
 recipient. The study must include, for Medicaid recipients who
 receive comprehensive substance abuse treatment, at least the
 following outcome measures:
 (1)  the average annual cost per recipient of a
 recipient's treatment under the Medicaid program, other than the
 comprehensive substance abuse treatment, including inpatient
 services other than inpatient labor and delivery services,
 outpatient services, and pharmaceutical and ancillary services;
 (2)  the average annual cost per recipient of the
 comprehensive substance abuse treatment; and
 (3) the average annual number, per recipient, of:
 (A) inpatient days;
 (B) emergency department visits; and
 (C) outpatient visits.
 (c)  To evaluate cost and utilization trends among Medicaid
 recipients who are at least 21 years of age and with respect to whom
 there is no evidence of a substance abuse disorder, the commission
 shall collect data regarding the outcome measures listed in
 Subsections (b)(1) and (3) for the same period described by
 Subsection (b).
 (d)  In conducting the study, the commission shall ensure
 that outcome data is evaluated using:
 (1)  appropriate demographic categories, including
 recipient age, disability, and income; and
 (2)  the type of service delivery model through which
 the recipient received services through Medicaid, including the
 fee-for-service, primary care case management, and health
 maintenance organization models.
 (e)  Using the data collected during the study, the
 commission shall evaluate cost and utilization trends and whether
 the provision of comprehensive substance abuse treatment through
 the state Medicaid program results in an increase in overall
 Medicaid spending. The commission shall prepare a report of the
 study data and the commission's determination and, not later than
 December 1, 2012, submit the report to the governor, the state
 auditor, and the Legislative Budget Board.
 (f)  If the commission determines that the provision of
 comprehensive substance abuse treatment through the state Medicaid
 program has resulted in an increase in overall Medicaid spending,
 the commission:
 (1)  may not continue to provide those services to a
 Medicaid recipient who is at least 21 years of age; and
 (2)  shall, in the report required by Subsection (e),
 recommend the repeal of Section 32.024(ff), Human Resources Code.
 (g) This section expires January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. Section 32.024, Human Resources Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (ff) to read as follows:
 (ff)  Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, the
 department shall provide comprehensive substance abuse treatment
 under the medical assistance program to a person who is at least 21
 years of age, has a substance abuse disorder, and otherwise
 qualifies for medical assistance. The department may not provide
 the treatment if, based on the study conducted under Section
 531.0226, Government Code, a determination is made that the
 treatment resulted in an increase in overall medical assistance
 program spending.  Comprehensive substance abuse treatment
 includes assessment, residential detoxification, outpatient
 detoxification, methadone maintenance, residential services,
 specialized residential services for women, outpatient chemical
 dependency counseling, and any other necessary services as
 determined by the department.
 SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2009, the Health and
 Human Services Commission shall submit to the Legislative Budget
 Board for approval the commission's proposed methodology,
 including outcome measures selected, for the cost-effectiveness
 study required by Section 531.0226, Government Code, as added by
 this Act.
 SECTION 4. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.