House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 969 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 532 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 532 | |
House | 02/24/2009 | Filed |