E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2534
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3970
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2400
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3465
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3466
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#827
|
Journal Page: 3466
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3465
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2203
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2178
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2177
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1860
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#326
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1829
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 533
|
House
|
02/24/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|