1 | 1 | | 81R9156 BEF-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Howard of Travis H.B. No. 1738 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to a study of nursing educational programs that require a |
---|
8 | 8 | | single clinical competency assessment. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 301.1571 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 301.1571. STUDY OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMS REQUIRING |
---|
13 | 13 | | SINGLE CLINICAL COMPETENCY ASSESSMENT. (a) The board shall study |
---|
14 | 14 | | whether graduates of a nursing educational program that requires |
---|
15 | 15 | | students to pass only a single clinical competency assessment are |
---|
16 | 16 | | able after graduation to practice in a clinical setting at a level |
---|
17 | 17 | | substantially equivalent to the graduates of a nursing educational |
---|
18 | 18 | | program that requires students to complete a required number of |
---|
19 | 19 | | supervised clinical learning experiences involving multiple, |
---|
20 | 20 | | ongoing assessments and feedback. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (b) In conducting the study, the board may consider a |
---|
22 | 22 | | nursing educational program that requires students to pass only a |
---|
23 | 23 | | single clinical competency assessment only if the program: |
---|
24 | 24 | | (1) has been requiring only a single clinical |
---|
25 | 25 | | competency assessment for at least 10 years; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) has students who reside in this state; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (3) has graduates who have been considered by the |
---|
28 | 28 | | board to be eligible to apply for a registered nurse license as a |
---|
29 | 29 | | result of graduating from the program on or before January 1, 2007; |
---|
30 | 30 | | and |
---|
31 | 31 | | (4) conducts the single clinical competency |
---|
32 | 32 | | assessment at a facility located in this state under the |
---|
33 | 33 | | supervision of a registered nurse who holds a master's or doctoral |
---|
34 | 34 | | degree in nursing and who has at least five years of experience on |
---|
35 | 35 | | the faculty of a nursing program approved to operate in this state. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (c) If a nursing educational program that requires students |
---|
37 | 37 | | to pass only a single clinical competency assessment has students |
---|
38 | 38 | | who are already licensed registered nurses, the study may consider |
---|
39 | 39 | | only students who are not already licensed registered nurses. |
---|
40 | 40 | | (d) The board shall begin the study, including the research |
---|
41 | 41 | | design and the compilation of results, not later than January 1, |
---|
42 | 42 | | 2010, and shall conclude the study not later than June 30, 2012, |
---|
43 | 43 | | except that the board may extend the study until June 30, 2014, if |
---|
44 | 44 | | additional time is needed to complete the study or compile the |
---|
45 | 45 | | results. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (e) If the study finds that graduates of a nursing |
---|
47 | 47 | | educational program that requires students to pass only a single |
---|
48 | 48 | | clinical competency assessment are not able after graduation to |
---|
49 | 49 | | practice in a clinical setting at a level substantially equivalent |
---|
50 | 50 | | to the graduates of a nursing educational program that requires |
---|
51 | 51 | | students to complete a required number of supervised clinical |
---|
52 | 52 | | learning experiences, the board shall allow a program participating |
---|
53 | 53 | | in the study to modify its program, not later than December 31, |
---|
54 | 54 | | 2017, to meet any standards required for graduates of the program to |
---|
55 | 55 | | be eligible to apply to the board for a license. The board may not |
---|
56 | 56 | | disqualify graduates of a program that is modifying its program |
---|
57 | 57 | | under this subsection from receiving a license under this chapter |
---|
58 | 58 | | before December 31, 2017. |
---|
59 | 59 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|