Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Subcommittee meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
House
|
04/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#144
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1165
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 1166
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1165
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
House
|
02/24/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|