E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/31/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5976
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5116
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#212
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1619
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1584
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1584
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
House
|
03/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|