Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1809 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hartnett (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1809
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 23, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to proceedings in a statutory probate court during the
 judge's absence.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 25, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 25.0033 to read as follows:
 Sec. 25.0033.  PROCEEDINGS DURING CERTAIN ABSENCES OF JUDGE.
 The judge of a statutory probate court may hear, determine, and
 enter orders in a matter or proceeding pending in another statutory
 probate court in the same county if:
 (1) the judge of the other court is absent; and
 (2)  the presiding judge of the statutory probate
 courts has not assigned a judge to the other court under Section
 25.0022.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *