Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2198 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2982 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Record vote | RV#678 | Journal Page: 2981 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2981 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2981 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2729 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2729 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Amended | 1-Pickett | Journal Page: 2729 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2729 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Filed |