E
|
05/20/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
E
|
05/13/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3680
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2317
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3436
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3680
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2096
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#213
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1620
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1584
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1584
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|