House | 05/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 550 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Filed |