E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4520
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5850
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5851
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1515
|
Journal Page: 5850
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5850
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5205
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 3583
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3583
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3582
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3582
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 925
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1149
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#123
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1106
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1079
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1079
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 1079
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1079
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|