House | 05/11/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3109 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1259 | Journal Page: 2481 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Postponed | 5/5/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2313 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2313 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Postponed | 5/2/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2202 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2202 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Postponed | 4/30/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2032 |
House | 04/29/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2032 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Postponed | 4/29/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1884 |
House | 04/27/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1884 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Postponed | 4/27/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1583 |
House | 04/20/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1583 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 551 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 551 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Filed |