Senate | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2440 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2440 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2366 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | RV#797 | Journal Page: 3318 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3318 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3318 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3277 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3277 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 280 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 280 | |
House | 11/12/2008 | Filed |