House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/12/2009 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 280 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 280 | |
House | 11/12/2008 | Filed |