House | 05/08/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3027 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 45 | Journal Page: 3027 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Postponed | 5/8/09 4:00 PM | Journal Page: 2719 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2719 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Postponed | 5/7/09 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2151 |
House | 04/30/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2151 | |
House | 04/30/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 554 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 554 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Filed |