House
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
SB1163
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 554
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 554
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|