House | 05/06/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2609 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 828 | Journal Page: 2609 |
House | 04/29/2009 | Postponed | 5/6/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2032 |
House | 04/29/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2031 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Postponed | 4/29/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1743 |
House | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1123 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 566 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 566 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Filed |