E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2534
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3970
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2400
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3475
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#829
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3474
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3208
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#145
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1139
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1139
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|