Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1908 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1908


 AN ACT
 relating to the safety of the fresh fruit and vegetables produced in
 this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. The legislature finds that:
 (1) the agricultural industry is a vital part of this
 state's economy, annually contributing $103 billion, or 9.2 percent
 of the gross state product, and is the state's second largest
 resource-based industry, with one in seven Texans being employed in
 some segment of the agricultural industry;
 (2) food safety must be a top state priority because an
 accidental or deliberate contamination of food or crops could be
 detrimental to the state's economy and would undermine consumer
 confidence in the integrity of food safety in this state;
 (3) the growing and processing of fresh fruits and
 vegetables is crucial to this state, and since September 11, 2001,
 awareness of the threat of contamination of those products has
 increased; and
 (4) this state should increase awareness of food
 safety among its growers and packers of fresh fruits and vegetables
 to avoid disastrous events.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 91, Agriculture Code, is
 amended by adding Section 91.009 to read as follows:
 Sec. 91.009.  COORDINATION OF FOOD SAFETY. (a)  The
 department is the lead agency for education and training and shall
 assist the fresh fruit and vegetable industries with food safety
 issues and may provide assistance to federal agencies in their
 implementation of voluntary guidelines relating to sound
 agricultural practices.
 (b)  The department shall coordinate, plan, and approve
 training and awareness programs for producers and packers of fresh
 fruits and vegetables. A program under this subsection must inform
 and educate producers and packers regarding:
 (1) sound agricultural practices;
 (2) proper food handling procedures;
 (3)  the prevention of accidental or deliberately
 planned outbreaks of disease; and
 (4) the enhancement of overall food safety.
 (c)  The department shall coordinate the planning and
 implementation of programs required by Subsection (b) with:
 (1) colleges and universities in this state;
 (2) the Texas AgriLife Extension Service;
 (3) Texas AgriLife Research;
 (4) the Department of State Health Services; and
 (5) private industry.
 (d)  The department may adopt rules to implement this
 section. In the development of rules for the certification of
 approved food safety curriculum or training, the department shall
 consult and coordinate with the Department of State Health
 Services.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1908 was passed by the House on April
 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1908 on May 14, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1908 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor