E
|
05/23/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
E
|
05/15/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2329
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2139
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1376
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#223
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 570
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 570
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|