House | 04/21/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1661 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 570 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 570 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Filed |