House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1862 | |
House | 03/30/2009 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 570 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 570 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Filed |